United States of America v. Harney et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Hillary A. Harney, Brad Roth and Southeast Nebraska Affordable Housing Council
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03019
Filed: February 3, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Nemaha
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Extend time to serve Complaint 1 . Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until 6/18/2009 within which to complete service by publication upon Defendant Hillary A. Harney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 1, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $43,584.97; accrued interest in the amount of $4,017.78; and interest accruing at the rate of $7.91 per day from June 1, 2009, until the date of entry of this decree ; interest will accrue on the sums from and after the date of entry of this decree at the legal rate of.48% computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 18 against the defendants. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants )(CJP, )
July 2, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $43,584.97; accrued interest in the amount of $4,017.78; and interest accruing at the rate of $7.91 per day from June 1, 2009, until the date of entry of thi s decree; interest will accrue on the sums from and after the date of entry of this decree at the legal rate of.48% computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 18 against the defendants. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed to defendants)(CJP)
August 14, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion for reconsideration 22 filed by the Defendant, Hillary A. Harney, seeking reconsideration of the amended judgment and decree of foreclosure 21 is granted insofar as a stay will be in effect until October 2, 2009, and otherwise the motion is denied. The sale of the subject real estate is stayed until October 2, 2009. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this memorandum and order to Hillary A. Harney at her last known address. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(JAE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Harney et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paul D. Boeshart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary A. Harney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Nebraska Affordable Housing Council
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]