Sadden v. First National Agency, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mohummed Sadden
Defendant: First National Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv03059
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Rent Lease & Ejectment Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend. Parties' joint motion to continue, (filing no. 14 ), is granted, and the deadline for filing the Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Conference is extended to July 20, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 20, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, March 4, 2010, at 12:00 p.m.(C )Place of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
February 25, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave. The parties' joint request to reschedule the Pretrial Conference, filing no. 26 , is granted. The Pretrial Conference is rescheduled and will be held telephonically on March 3, 2010 at 12:00 P.M. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 3, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding pretrial conference. Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction shall be filed on or before March 13, 2010. Any motion to strike plaintiff's jury request shall be filed on or befor e March 24, 2010. Objections to trial exhibits shall be listed and filed on or before March 24, 2010. Paragraghs G and H of the pretrial conference memorandum are modified as set forth in this order. Trial of this case is continued to May 17, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
March 25, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 Motion to Continue; Jury Trial set for 6/15/2010 in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge Richard G. Kopf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
June 14, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that:(1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the ma gistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, t his case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's June 15, 2010 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. ***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 7/14/2010. Termed 6/15/2010 trial date. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
May 18, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER - It has come to the court's attention that the link to filing no. 5 in the courts order dated May 15, 2009 (filing no. 8 ) is incorrect. IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED: The order, filing no. 8 , is amended as follows: Defendant's motion for enlargement of time, filing no. 5 is granted and the deadline to answer or otherwise plead is extended to June 29, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadden v. First National Agency, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohummed Sadden
Represented By: Paul D. Lundberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Agency, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]