Ties et al v. Strain et al

Plaintiff: Larry Ties and Loretta A. Ties
Defendant: Alan Brian Strain and Strain Enterprises, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03172
Filed: August 12, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Buffalo
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Thursday, July 1, 2010, at 9:00 a.m.(C)Pl ace of hearing: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
March 26, 2010 34 Featured Case AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend; A jury trial is set to commence on January 24, 2011; The pretrial conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on January 6, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.; The discovery and deposition deadline is September 17, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
October 28, 2010 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by plaintiffs' counsel, Jeffery H. Jacobsen, (filing no. 40 ), is granted. On or before November 22, 2010, the plaintiffs, or each of them, shall either: (1) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf; or (2) file a statement notifying the court of their intent to litigate this case without counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the non-complying part y's claims for want of prosecution. Counsel Jeffery H. Jacobsen shall promptly provide a copy of this memorandum and order to the plaintiffs, and shall file a certificate of service (which includes the plaintiffs' addresses along with the date and method of service) stating he has done so. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
November 29, 2010 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff Larry Ties is given until December 9, 2010 to either: (a) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on his behalf; or (2) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of Larry Ties' claims for want of prosecution. The clerk shall mail a copy of this memorandum and order to plaintiff Larry Ties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)
February 25, 2011 50 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendation 48 and granting Stipulation for Dismissal 49 . IT IS ORDERED: The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation 48 are adopted and all claims alleged by the plaintiff, Larry Ties, are dismissed with prejudice for want of prosecution. The joint stipulation and motion filed by the remaining parties 49 is granted and all claims alleged by the plaintiff, Loretta A. Ties, and all claims alleged by the third-party plaintiff, Alan Brian Strain d/b/a Strain Enterprises, are dismissed with prejudice, with costs taxed to the parties incurring the same. Final judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to Pro Se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ties et al v. Strain et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Ties
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Jacobsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta A. Ties
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Jacobsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Brian Strain
Represented By: David A. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strain Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Dudley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]