United States of America v. Rader et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Lorna S. Rader, Alvin L. Rader, Blue Valley Community Action, Inc., Joseph F. Chilen, Trustee and Pacesetter Corporation, The
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03180
Filed: August 25, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT granting filing 9 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff is granted until January 26, 2010, within which to complete service by publication. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
March 15, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $63,985.56 , together with interest accruing at the rate of $9.3017 per day from February 15, 2010, until the date of entry of this decree, plus accrued interest of .3 9% computed daily and compounded annual until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting Plaintiff USA's motion for Default Judgment 22 against defendants. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM) (Copy sent via U.S. Mail to defendant Lorna S. Rader). (GJG) Modified on 3/23/2010 to correct text regarding calculations (GJG, ).
July 8, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding MOTION to Confirm Sale 29 . Objections due 7/29/10. If no objections then plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Sale shall beconsidered without hearing. In the event that an objection to confirmation of sale is filed by the date specif ied above, all issues raised by said objection will be heard before the Court at 12:00 p.m. on August 6, 2010, in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(ADB, )
November 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - With the agreement of the Chief Judge and the other district judges, Judge Kopf will handle all magistrate matters for this case. The district judge assigned to try this case has not changed. Defendants Rader, Blue Valley Community Action, an d Pacesetter Corporation shall file their response to the plaintiff's amended complaint, filing 7 on or before November 25, 2009. Attached is a "Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Conference." Counsel are directed to meet a nd confer and file the report by December 14, 2009. A final scheduling order will be entered based on the Rule 26(f) report. The Clerk's office shall set a case management deadline for this report. This order applies to the parties, even if they are not represented by counsel. The Clerks office shall send a copy of this order to the served defendants. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Rader et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna S. Rader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin L. Rader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Valley Community Action, Inc., Joseph F. Chilen, Trustee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter Corporation, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]