United States of America- Department of Veterans Affairs v. Rohr et al

 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03240
Filed: November 23, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint 6 and Motion for Publication 8 . This order shall be published in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1655. The plaintiff shall have on or before April 5, 2010, to effect service of the summons and complaint on the defendant Unknown Spouse of Ricky E. Rohr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (BJC)
May 11, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff shall take appropriate action against the defendants or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute on or before the close of business May 25, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
June 2, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the principal amount of $21,693.29 plus accrued interest of $1,620.78, together with interest accruing at the rate of $3.57 per day from 5/28/2010 until the date of entry of this decree; setting priority of liens and directing the sale of premises; granting Plaintiff USA's motion for default judgment 18 against Defendants Ricky E. Rohr and Unknown Spouse of Ricky E. Rohr. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to defendants via U.S. Mail) (JSF)
August 5, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 24 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America- Department of Veterans Affairs v. Rohr et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]