Mehner Family Trust et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al

Defendant: City of Omaha, Department of Homeland Security, Jane Doe 1-50, John Doe 1-50, Douglas County Sheriff's Office, Timothy Dunning, John Gutsmiedl, Matthew Loux, Dean Miller, Omaha Police Department, Secret Service, Jan Sharp, Joe Stecher, Nancy Svoboda, U.S. Attorney's Office, Thomas Warren and Michael Wellman
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Mehner, Anthony Q. Mehner, Barbara A. Mehner, Mark A. Mehner, Raymond H. Mehner and Mehner Family Trust
Case Number: 4:2010cv03009
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Christopher A. Pfanstiel and the firm of Lewis, Pfanstiel & Williams, PC, LLO. Mr. Pfanstiel shall serve a copy of this order on the plaintiffs and file a certificate of serv ice stating he has done so. Plaintiffs Raymond H. Mehner, Barbara A. Mehner, Mark A. Mehner, Andrea L. Mehner, and Anthony Q. Mehner are given 20 days from the date of this order in which to either: (1) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf; or (2) file a statement informing the court of their intent to proceed in this case without counsel. Plaintiff Mehner Family Trust is given 20 days from the date of this order to obtain the serv ices of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf. As to each plaintiff, absent timely compliance with this order, this case is subject to dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ) Modified on 6/25/2010 (CRZ, ).
July 22, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the following addresses for each of the plaintiffs, and shall mail copies of filing no. 21 and this order to the following: Raymond Mehner, Individually and as Trustee of the Mehner Family Trust, 1416 Galaxie Drive,Hinton, IA 51024; Barbara Mehner,1416 Galaxie Drive, Hinton, IA 51024; Mark A. Mehner, #14078-047, FMC Rochester, Federal Medical Center, P.O. Box 4000, Rochester, MN 55903; Andrea L. Mehner, 1201 North 138th Circle, Omaha, NE 68514; Anthony Q. Mehner, 1201 North 138th Circle, Omaha, NE 68514; The deadlines set forth in the courts order of June 25, 2010, (filing no. 21 ), are extended. On or before August 11, 2010: a. Plaintiffs Raymond H. Mehner, Barbara A. Me hner, Mark A. Mehner, Andrea L. Mehner, and Anthony Q. Mehner shall either: (1) obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf; or (2) file a statement informing the court of their intent to procee d in this case without counsel. b. Plaintiff Mehner Family Trust shall obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf. If the plaintiffs, or any one of them, fails to timely comply with the requirem ents of paragraph 2 above, this case will be subject to dismissal as to the non-complying plaintiff(s). The clerk shall mail a copy of the order to plaintiffs former attorney, Christopher A. Pfanstiel, at his address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR, )
August 19, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion filed by the plaintiffs, The Mehner Family Trust, Raymond H.Mehner, Barbara A. Mehner, Mark A. Mehner, Andrea L. Mehner, and Anthony Q. Mehner, to extend the deadline for obtaining new counsel filing 25 is granted. On or before 10/11/2010 Plaintiffs shall obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on their behalf; or (2) file a statement informing the court of their intent to proceed in this case without counsel. Plain tiff Mehner Family Trust shall obtain the services of substitute counsel and have that attorney file an appearance on its behalf. If the plaintiffs, or any one of them, fails to timely comply with the requirements of paragraph 2 above, this case will be subject to dismissal as to the non-complying plaintiff. The deadline for filing defendants' response to the plaintiffs' complaint is stayed pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 12, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS, RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER - IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Richard G. Kopf, United States District Judge that: 1) The claims of the Mehner Family Trust be dismissed, and; 2) As to the remaining individual plaintiffs, the case be reassigned to the pro se docket. The parties are notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the courts adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 15, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court adopts the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (filing no. 29 ). Accordingly, the claims of the Mehner Family Trust are dismissed. Defendants have 21 days to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
June 1, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiffs failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's order. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. All pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
August 17, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Andrea Mehner's Motion to Set Aside Judgment (filing no. 51 ) is granted, but only as to her claims against Defendants. Defendants shall have 20 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to answer or otherwise resp ond to Andrea Mehner's claims against them. The clerk's office is directed to reopen this matter, but only as to Plaintiff Andrea Mehner's claims against Defendants. The clerks office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 6, 2011: Deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
January 17, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall have until February 17, 2012, in which to submit a response to the pending Motions to Dismiss, along with any "material that is pertinent to the motion." The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: February 17, 2012: deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Motions. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
May 11, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION - A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehner Family Trust et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Sheriff's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dunning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gutsmiedl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Loux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secret Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Stecher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wellman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea L. Mehner
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Q. Mehner
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Mehner
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Mehner
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond H. Mehner
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehner Family Trust
Represented By: Christopher A. Pfanstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]