Weatherwax v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Number: 4:2010cv03025
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend. the expert disclousure deadlines are extended, and the discovery and deposition deadline is extended to December 27, 2009. The pretrial conference remains scheduled for January 20, 2011 and the trial remains scheduled to commence, at the court's call, on February 7, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 5, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to continue the trial date 44 is granted. The Final Progression Order 12 is amended as follows: A jury trial is set to commence on January 30, 2012. The Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2012 at 11:00 AM and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)
June 22, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion in limine 53 is denied without prejudice to its reassertion during the pretrial conference which will be held in chambers on the first day of trial. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)
February 13, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER - The undersigned Judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(4). Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp is requested to reassign this case. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
November 19, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting the Joint 93 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. this action is dismissed with prejudice and judgment entered. each party to pay his or its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
April 15, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before May 17, 2010, they shall jointly file a Rule 26(f) Report, a copy of which is attached. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference is needed to complete the Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified in the attached Rule 26(f) Report, on or before May 10, 2010, a party shall contact my chambers by phone or email at the number and email address noted in this Order, to arrange a conference call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weatherwax v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]