Coleman

Plaintiff: Jerry W Coleman
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv03137
Filed: July 16, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiff is given until December 3, 2010 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
December 4, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION to dismiss this case for failure to serve or for want of prosecution. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
January 5, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Magistrate Judge Zwart's Findings and Recommendation 6 shall not be disturbed and is hereby adopted; Plaintiff's complaint shall be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry W Coleman
Represented By: Richard A. Haydu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]