Bliss v. BNSF Railway Company

Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: David Bliss
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03057
Filed: April 19, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Status Conference set for 9/2/2011 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. The parties Rule 26 mandatory disclosures shall be served on or before July 15, 2011. The parties may initiate written discovery thereafter.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
September 6, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
September 13, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TEL)
April 2, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting joint Stipulation for Dismissal 26 . This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bliss v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Thomas C. Sattler
Represented By: James B. Luers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bliss
Represented By: William J. McMahon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]