Peterson v. United States of America et al

Petitioner: Jay S. Peterson
Respondent: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service and Linda Haws
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03071
Filed: May 9, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (Filing No. 10 ). The court intends to treat the Motion as one for summary judgment. Petitioner shall have until November 30, 2011, in which to submit a response to the pending Mot ion to Dismiss, along with any "material that is pertinent to the motion." ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/30/2011: deadline for Petitioner to respond to Motion. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
February 23, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk's office is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect that the United States of America is the only respondent. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 10 ), construed as a motion for summary ju dgment, is granted. Accordingly, the IRS may proceed with enforcement of the summonses previously issued to Union Bank, JP Morgan Chase, and A&A. Peterson's Petition (Filing No. 1 ) is denied and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
May 8, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 19 filed by Jay S. Peterson. Petitioner's Notice of Appeal is deemed timely filed. Petitioner shall have until June 8, 2012, in which to either pay the $455.00 appellate filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk of the court shall send to Petitioner the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: June 8, 2012: Deadline to submit IFP on appeal or pay filing fee. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with form)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Peterson v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay S. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: James C. Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Haws
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]