McAdams et al v. Gilsdorf et al

Plaintiff: Wanzek Construction, Inc. and Robin L. McAdams
Defendant: Myrle D. Gilsdorf and Andrews Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03117
Filed: July 25, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Extend. The date for filing Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on the choice of law issues is extended to October 31, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 6, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Change Venue. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
April 23, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Compel Videorecording of the inspection of May 5, 2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
July 24, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Extend the choice of law summary judgment deadline. Status Conference set for 12/4/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiffs shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdams et al v. Gilsdorf et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L. McAdams
Represented By: Robert R. Moodie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrle D. Gilsdorf
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]