Zierke v. Reiman

Defendant: Korey L. Reiman
Plaintiff: Gary Zierke, Jr.
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03177
Filed: October 17, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 3 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.56 by March 6, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in re sponse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 6, 2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
April 2, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (Filing No. 12 ) is granted in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall have until April 23, 2012, to show cause for his failure to pay the court-assessed initial par tial filing fee. If Plaintiff fails to respond by April 23, 2012, or fails to show cause, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to comply with this court's orders. If Plaintiff elects to show cause, he shall submit c opies of any relevant consent forms or an affidavit showing that any available portion of the initial fee was withdrawn from his account and transmitted to the clerk of the district court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party) (AOA)
May 25, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
January 25, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before February 17, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zierke v. Reiman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korey L. Reiman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Zierke, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]