SaLazar v. Norfolk Regional Center et al

Defendant: John Kroll, Mental Health Board Platte County, Marsha L. Nelson, Norfolk Regional Center, Stephen O'Neill, Daryl Stephenson, John Doe's, Michael Gettman and Carl K. Hart, Jr.
Plaintiff: Ambrosio SaLazar, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03207
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss (filing no. 10 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to dismiss the Mental Health Board of Platte County and Carl K. Hart, Jr., shall from this matter. Plaintiffs Complaint fails to state a Fourteenth Amendment claim related to his restraints upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff shall have until March 12, 2012, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a Fourteenth Amendment claim related to his restraints upon which rel ief may be granted, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, his Fourteenth Amendment claim related to his restraints will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be gra nted. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 7 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Because Plaintiff has paid the initial partial filing fee in this matter (see Docket Sheet), Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time (fi ling no. 8 ) and Motion Regarding Filing Fees (filing no. 9 ) are denied as moot. If Plaintiff has questions regarding the collection of the remaining filing fee installments, he should refer to the courts December 5, 2012, Memorandum and Order. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012: Check for amended complaint on March 12, 2012). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 5, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 13 ) is denied. Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against the NRC and the named individual Defendants in their official capacities are dismissed. Plaintiff's remaining claims may proceed to service. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send SEVEN (7) summons forms and SEV EN (7) USM-285 forms (for service on NRC and the individual Defendants in both their individual and official capacities) to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "August 6, 2012: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (AOA)
August 28, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel (filing nos. 25 and 36 ) are denied. Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer (filing no. 42 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend (filing no. 43 ) is granted. All dep ositions, whether or not they are intended to be used at trial, shall be completed by October 4, 2012. The Final Pretrial Conference will be held before the Magistrate Judge on February 7, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. The Clerk of the court is directed to se t a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Pretrial conference before Magistrate. Judge Cheryl Zwart to be held on February 7, 2013. ( Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2013 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
December 5, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 )is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.46 by December 30, 2011, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 30, 2011: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (AOA)
November 16, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (filing no. 53 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (filing no. 49 ) and Motion to Take Deposition (filing no. 51 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion after the court rules on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment (filing nos. 56 , 57 and 60 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
January 14, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Motion to Continue Progression Dates (filing no. 76 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to cancel the Final Pretrial Conference in this matter that is currently scheduled for February 7, 2013. A separ ate progression order resetting the dates for the Final Pretrial Conference, and all associated deadlines, may be entered after the court resolves the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
April 11, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 65 ) is granted. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion (filing no. 72 ), Mot ion in Opposition to Defendants' Reply Brief (filing no. 77 ), Motion to Deny Defendants' Dispositive Pleading (filing no. 78 ), Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 80 ) and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (filing no. 82 ) are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SaLazar v. Norfolk Regional Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Board Platte County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha L. Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Regional Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Stephenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gettman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl K. Hart, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrosio SaLazar, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]