Kislyak v. LRC

Plaintiff: Pavel Kislyak
Defendant: LRC
Case Number: 4:2011cv03223
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before January 13, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further noti ce. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 13, 2012: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party along with form)(GJG)
February 1, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. 5 ) is provisionally granted. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this matter. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate officials at the Lincoln Regional Center. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
March 2, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kislyak v. LRC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pavel Kislyak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]