Kislyak v. Ostrander et al

Plaintiff: Pavel Kislyak
Defendant: LRC Forensic Unit and Mark Ostrander
Case Number: 4:2011cv03225
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before January 13, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notic e. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/13/2012:deadline for payment of filing of IFP application.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party as directed)(MKR)
February 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this matter; and The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate officials at the Lincoln Regional Center. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed to Lincoln Reg ional Center)(MKR)
March 5, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiffs Complaint (Filing No. 1) fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. However, Plaintiff shall have until April 4, 2012, to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plain tiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs claims will be dismissed without further notice; In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (Filing No. 1 ), and any newallegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may resultin the abandonment of claims; Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Check for amended complaint on April 4, 2012. ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/4/2012.) Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 10, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kislyak v. Ostrander et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pavel Kislyak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRC Forensic Unit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ostrander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]