Kislyak v. L.R.C et al

Defendant: Amber and L.R.C
Plaintiff: Mr. Pavel Kislyak
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03227
Filed: December 16, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2011 4 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before January 22, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice . The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 22, 2012: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy and forms mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
February 1, 2012 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUMM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 5 ) is provisionally granted. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this matter. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate officials at the Lincoln Regional Center. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (AOA)
March 5, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After initial review, Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. However, Plaintiff shall have until April 4, 2012, to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff's claims will be dismissed without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Check for amended complaint on April 4, 2012. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
April 10, 2012 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kislyak v. L.R.C et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.R.C
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Pavel Kislyak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]