Greater Omaha Packing Company, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Greater Omaha Packing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and B-Line Logistics, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03053
Filed: March 20, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER setting August 10, 2012 consent deadline.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 17, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss defendant B-Line Logistics. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), all claims against B-Line Logistics, LLC have been voluntarily dismissed without prejudice as a matter of right. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 18, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (39) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:12-cv-03053-CRZ and granting in part and denying in part (31) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ. Cases are consolidated f or discovery and pretrial preparation purposes only. Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before October 8, 2012, they shall jointly file a Form 35 (Rule 26 (f)) Report. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
January 2, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Counsel for the parties shall confer and, on or before January 15, 2013, they shall jointly file an abbreviated Rule 26(f) Report, a copy of which is attached. If one or more of the parties believes a planning conference i s needed to complete the abbreviated Rule 26(f) Report, or if the parties cannot agree on one or more of the deadlines identified or case progression issues raised in the attached Rule 26(f) Report, on or before January 8, 2013, a party shall contact my chambers. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 1, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER - Liberty Mutual's motions (4:12cv3053, Filing No. 64 , and 4:12cv3054, Filing No. 59 ), are granted. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Warren K. Urbom, Senior United States District Judge, in Co urtroom 4, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on October 7, 2013, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. A conference with counsel will be held in Judge Urbom's chambers at 8:30 a.m. on the first day of trial. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on September 24, 2013 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. To facilitate this conferencing method, the parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on September 23, 20 13. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. The deposition deadline is May 28, 2013. All other provisions of the courts prior progression order, (Filing No. 50 ), remain in effect. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 1, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (64) Motion to Amend in case 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ; granting (59) Motion to Amend in case 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ. Deposition deadline is May 28, 1013. Deadline for filing motions to dismiss and motions for summary judgment is June 7, 2013. The jury trial is set to commence before Warren K. Urbom, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 4, United State Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska at 9:00 a.m. on October 7, 2013, for a duration of three (3) days. An in-chambers conference will be held before Judge Urbom at 8:30 a.m. on October 7, 2013. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart on September 24, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. by WebEx. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZOrdered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
April 5, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (68) Oral Motion to Amend Discovery Deadlines in case 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ; granting (63) Oral Motion to Amend Discovery Deadlines in case 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
June 17, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL - The Stipulation of Dismissal is approved. The consolidated cases captioned above are dismissed with prejudice, witheach party paying its own costs and attorneys' fees. Member Cases: 4:12-cv-03053-WKU-CRZ, 4:12-cv-03054-WKU-CRZ. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Greater Omaha Packing Company, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Omaha Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Ruksakiati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Line Logistics, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]