Hornady Manufacturing Company v. Heizer Firearms, LLC et al

Defendant: Heizer Defense, LLC, Heizer Firearms, LLC and Central Holding Corp.
Plaintiff: Hornady Manufacturing Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03117
Filed: June 11, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER OF DISMISSALWITH PREJUDICE - All claims Plaintiff Hornady Manufacturing Company ("Hornady") has asserted against Defendant Heizer Defense, LLC ("Heizer Defense") and all counterclaims Heizer Defense has asserted again st Hornady in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice, as fully resolved through a settlement, with each party to bear its respective attorneys' fees. This Order of Dismissal only applies to Heizer Defense and to no other defendant. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA, )
January 7, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. In Chambers Conference set for 1/6/2014 at 8:30 a.m. before Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2013 at 09:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 6/11/2013 at 01:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
January 18, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 44 Motion to Strike counterclaim. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 26, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The above captioned action, including all counterclaims, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, complete record waived. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hornady Manufacturing Company v. Heizer Firearms, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heizer Defense, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heizer Firearms, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Holding Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hornady Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Andre R. Barry
Represented By: Brett L. Foster
Represented By: Mark A. Miller
Represented By: Stephen M. Sansom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]