Margraves v. TA Operating LLC et al

Defendant: C.R. England, Inc. and TA Operating
Plaintiff: Debra Margraves
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03152
Filed: July 25, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Oral Motion. Plaintiff's deadline for identifying expert witnesses expected to testify at the trial is March 1, 2013. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)) are: For the plaintiff(s): May 1, 2013; For the defendant(s): July 1, 2013; For rebuttals): July 31, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
April 3, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Email Motion. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff(s): June 14, 2013, For the defendant(s): August 1, 2013, For rebuttal(s): August 15, 2013.The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is August 30, 2013. Pretrial Conference is reset for 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for paricipating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
December 10, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 48 Defendant TA Operating LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Amended to correct filing number of Motion only.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Margraves v. TA Operating LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Margraves
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]