Montin v. Gibson

Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Defendant: Bill Gibson
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03171
Filed: August 13, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 6 Featured Case RECUSAL ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the case is referred to the chief judge for reassignment. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
September 20, 2012 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this matter. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate officials at the Lincoln Regional Center. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to Lincoln Regional Center Official)(GJG)
November 8, 2012 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Montin shall have until December 6, 2012, to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendant, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Montin fails to file a suffici ent amended complaint, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the followi ng text: Check for amended complaint on December 6, 2012, and dismiss if none filed. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montin v. Gibson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gibson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]