Brantely v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Kenneth Brantely
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv03215
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant's 26 Motion to Compel. In addition to the information disclosed during the hearing held on July 24, 2013, the plaintiff shall serve on defense counsel all documents plaintiff will rely upon at trial by no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 25, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
August 2, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Mr. Kenneth Brantley is reminded that he is not to call the Clerks Office or my Chambers with questions regarding how to handle his case without opposing counsel also on the telephone line. Plaintiff is again reminded to ref er to his copy of the Local Rules and the Guide to Self-Representation for Non-Prisoners, both of which were provided to him following the hearing on July 24, 2013, to assist him in pursuing this case without counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 12, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the railroad's 42 Motion to Compel. On or before September 24, 2013, the plaintiff shall serve on the railroad full and complete responses to the railroads interrogatories and requests for production. The plaintiff is remin ded that if he fails to disclose information in his possession or control, either as part of his mandatory disclosures or in response to the railroads discovery requests, he may later be barred from using the undisclosed information to prove his c ase. The plaintiff is further reminded that he must promptly advise the court if his address changes. The failure to do so will inhibit his ability to receive copies of case filings and court orders and may also result in dismissal of his lawsuit. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 12, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
October 14, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 53 Objection; granting 54 Motion to Compel compliance with subpoena. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 16, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 28, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Dismissal (Filing 58 ) is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart for disposition of the requests for costs and fees and for a Findings and Recommendation regarding the motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint with prejudice as a sanction for Plaintiff's failure to attend his deposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
March 4, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- The magistrate judge's findings and recommendation (filing 66 ) is adopted. The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 63 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR) .
December 4, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiff shall have until January 2, 2013, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendant in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amende d complaint, Plaintiffs claims against Defendant will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegat ions of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times wh ile this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/2/2013:check for amended complaint on January 2, 2013.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 13, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal IFP (filing no. 72 is granted. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
March 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiffs Motion for Paperwork (filing no. 8 ) is denied. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons forms which the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court sha ll send ONE summons forms and ONE USM-285 forms to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence o f the forms, service of process cannot occur. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: July 9, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons. ***Pro Se Case Management Dead lines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/9/2013: Check for completion of serviceof summons.) 8 MOTION for paperwork filed by Kenneth Brantely. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with one Summons and USM-285 form)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantely v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Brantely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]