Campanile, M.D. v. New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.

Counter Claimant: New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.
Defendant: New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.
Plaintiff: Francesco Campanile, M.D.
Counter Defendant: Francesco Campanile, M.D.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03005
Filed: January 8, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
December 11, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER - The discovery and dispositive motion deadlines are stayed, and the trial and pretrial conference settings are cancelled pending further order of the court. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on Mar ch 10, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the status of the parties' settlement efforts and any further case progression deadlines. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call.( Telephone Conference set for 3/10/2014 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
April 10, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDER - The Court has been advised that the parties in this case intend to dismiss their claims. On or before May 12, 2014, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the u ndersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of May 12, 2014. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 5/12/2014.) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campanile, M.D. v. New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.
Represented By: Minja Herian
Represented By: John M. Lingelbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New West Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Surgery, P.C.
Represented By: Minja Herian
Represented By: John M. Lingelbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesco Campanile, M.D.
Represented By: Todd A. West
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Francesco Campanile, M.D.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]