Wagner v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Wagner
Defendant: Robert Husmann, Jim Helgoth, Kevin Campbell, Roger Wiegert, Jimmie Graves, DL Hahn, John Jefferson and Rexford Weller
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03006
Filed: January 9, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 35 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's Findings and Recommendation 33 . The plaintiff's motion to remand (filing 24 ) is denied. The plaintiff's motion to dismiss all official-capacity claims (filing 7 ) is granted. The plaintiff's motion to dismiss all individual defendants except Kevin Campbell (filing 29 ) is granted. There being no just reason for delay, judgment shall be entered by separate document dismissing without prejudice all claims alleged against all defendants except claims alleged against Kevin Campbell in his individual capacity only. This action shall proceed on the amended complaint (filing 28 ) that the plaintiff has filed against Kevin Campbell in his individual capacity. The defendants motion to dismiss the original complaint (filing 26 ) is denied without prejudice, as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
July 15, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant Kevin Campbell's 40 Motion for Leave to file a response to the plaintiff's complaint out of time is granted. Defendant Campbell's answer or response shall be filed on or before July 3, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
August 5, 2013 45 Featured Case INITIAL PROGRESSION ORDER based on upon the representations of the parties in their Rule 26(f) planning report. Mandatory disclosures shall be severed by August 30, 2013. The parties shall engage in discovery limited to the issue of qualified imm unity. The depositions of the respective parties shall be completed on or before September 30, 2013. Written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, limited to the issue of qualified immunity, shall be complet ed by November 1, 2013. Defendants motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity shall be filed on or before December 2, 2013. ( Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
January 2, 2014 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's 53 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until January 13, 2014 to respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 50 .Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
February 27, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER granting the 60 Motion to Continue. The telephonic hearing set for March 3, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. is continued pending the court's ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall contact Chambers at (402) 437-1670 within ten (10) days after the court's summary judgment ruling to schedule a telephonic conference regarding further progression of this case, if necessary. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wagner v. Campbell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wagner
Represented By: Elaine A. Waggoner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Husmann
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Helgoth
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Campbell
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wiegert
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Graves
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Hahn
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jefferson
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexford Weller
Represented By: Charles W. Campbell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]