Torres v. Houston

Respondent: Robert Houston
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Marco Enrique Torres, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03027
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner Marco Enrique Torres, Jr.'s Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed with prejudice. Petitioner Marco Enrique Torres, Jr.'s requests for a new trial, an evidentiary hearing, and an expansion of the record are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
December 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 20 ) is denied. A certificate of appealability shall not issue in this action. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall provide a copy of this order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies sent as directed and mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
February 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk shall randomly assign the pending (non-death penalty) habeas petition to one of the judges in the death penalty habeas corpus docket. If a subsequent habeas petition is filed challenging the death penalty case, that petition shall be assigned to the same judge drawn pursuant to paragraph 1 above. The pro se staff attorneys are not assigned to work on the cases mentioned in paragraphs 1 and 2 above. On the contrary, the judge to whom these cases are assigned shall use his or her chambers staff to process these cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
February 27, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing 2 ) is provisionally granted and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
February 27, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (filing 1 ), the Court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. Petitioner's Mot ion for Appointment of Counsel (filing 4 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-cla ss mail. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 16, 2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of Cou rt is directed to set a case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 16, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copy mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Enrique Torres, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]