Progressive Universal Insurance Company v. L.P. et al

Defendant: Regional West Medical Center, Armando Portillo, Norma Portillo, L. P., Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, Med-Trans Corporation, Kimball County Hospital, Kimball County, Children's Hospital Colorado, University Physicians Inc., Regional West Physicians Clinic and Valley Ambulance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03032
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (filing 17 ) is granted. Bradley A. Boyum, Attorney at Law, 14301 First National Bank Parkway, Suite 100, Omaha, Nebraska 68154, is appointed as Guardian Ad Lit em to represent the interests of Defendant L.P. during the pendency of this action or until further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail copies of this Order to Defendants in this case, as well as to Mr. Boyum at the address listed above. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Copies mailed as directed)(TCL )
March 19, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that by or before April 5, 2013, Bradley A. Boyum shall submit a brief status report to the Court, providing his best estimate of the time, travel and expense which may be associated with him serving as guardian ad litem for L.P. in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
April 30, 2013 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Plaintiff's unopposed Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Filing No. 27 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to release $3,906.00 from the $25,000.00 of deposited f unds to the Plaintiff, at the following address: Progressive Universal Insurance Company c/o Renee A. Eveland Wolfe Snowden Hurd Luers & Ahl, LLP Wells Fargo Center 1248 O Street, Suite 800 Lincoln, NE 68508. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (E-mailed copy to Finance)(TCL )
May 3, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Appointment of Bradley A. Boyum and to Appoint Rhonda R. Flower as Guardian Ad Litem (filing 25 ) is denied as moot. Mr. Boyum's obligation to provide a status report in response t o Progressive's motion to reconsider is deemed satisfied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the status report and case management deadlines related to the motion to reconsider (filing 25 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (TCL )
May 8, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
July 31, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Report and Recommendation of Chief U.S. Bankruptcy Court Judge Thomas L. Saladino (Filing No. 34 ) is adopted. The Order of Reference (Filing No. 33 ) to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn. This case shall progress in this Court. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
September 25, 2013 41 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company's Motion for Dismissal (Filing No. 37 ), is granted; 2. Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company is dismissed as a party in this proce eding, with prejudice; 3. Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company and its affiliates are discharged from further liability relating to $25,000 in proceeds from an automobile insurance policy, Policy No. 900370324, connected to a 2003 Dodge Durango involved in an accident; 4. The Clerk of the Court shall continue to hold the balance of the funds deposited by Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company in the registry of the Court, invested in an interest-bearing account, until further notice of the Court; 5. Defendants, together with their officers, agents, servants, employees and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them, are hereby restrained and enjoined from instituting or pros ecuting any action against Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company in any state or federal court for the recovery of the funds or otherwise affecting the funds at issue in this case; and 6. Plaintiff Progressive Universal Insurance Company will serve copies of this Order on all parties, and file proof of service within ten days of this Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Progressive Universal Insurance Company v. L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional West Medical Center
Represented By: Andrew W. Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Portillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Portillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. P.
Represented By: Bradley A. Boyum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Trans Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball County Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimball County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Hospital Colorado
Represented By: Ellen E. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Physicians Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional West Physicians Clinic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Ambulance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]