Concord Hospitality, Inc. et al v. First Franchise Capital Corporation

Defendant: First Franchise Capital Corporation
Plaintiff: Concord Hospitality, Inc. and Concord B Que Corp.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03048
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER - The parties' Stipulation to Entry of Protective Order 32 , is hereby accepted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
October 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' joint 34 Stipulation, treated as a motion, is granted as follows: Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to November 1, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
October 24, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal. The clerk of the court shall seal Filing No. 27 in accordance with NECivR 5.3(c). Plaintiffs shall have 10 days from today's date to file redacted copies of the aforesaid evidentiary filings, in accordance with NECivR 5.3(a) and (b). Absent compliance with this order, the filings may be unsealed by the court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
November 18, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 the parties' Joint Stipulation. Plaintiffs' reply regarding their motion for summary judgment 26 is extended to December 11, 2013. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment 39 is exten ded to December 11, 2013. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion to defer 43 is extended to December 11, 2013. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for revision of the progression schedule 18 , including the setting of new dates for the final pretrial conference and the commencement of trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
January 2, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the paties' joint stipulation 51 , treated as a motion, is granted as follows: Defendant's reply date regarding its 43 Motion to defer is extended to January 3, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
February 26, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the parties' joint 60 Stipulation for Dismissal, IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concord Hospitality, Inc. et al v. First Franchise Capital Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franchise Capital Corporation
Represented By: Daniel E. Klaus
Represented By: Brian S. Kruse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R. Engler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord B Que Corp.
Represented By: Timothy R. Engler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]