Federal National Mortgage Association v. Estate of Bonnie Matulka, et al.

Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Estate of Bonnie Matulka, J. Doe and Michael Matulka
Case Number: 4:2013cv03049
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's motions to remand (No. 4:13-cv-3049 filing 10, No. 4:13-cv-3050 filing 10, No. 4:13-cv-3051 filing 9, No. 4:13-cv-3052 filing 9, No. 4:13-cv-3053 filing 9, No. 4:13-cv-3054 filing 9) are gr anted. These actions are remanded to the District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska. The plaintiff shall be awarded costs and expenses, including attorney fees, upon the filing of a bill of costs pursuant to NECivR 54.1 and a motion for attorney fees pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) and NECivR 54.3. Member Cases: 4:13-cv-03049-JMG-CRZ et al.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
July 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (filing 14 ) is granted. The plaintiff is awarded $875 in attorney fees in the above-captioned case, to be recoverable jointly and severally from the defendants in this cas e. This award shall be in addition to any award in the other cases with which above-captioned case was consolidated. The Clerk of the Court is authorized to accept payment pursuant to this award and deliver those funds to the plaintiff's counsel. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall brief the issue of whether this court has federal subject matter jurisdiction over the above-captioned cases. The parties will brief the matter simultaneously, with the opening briefs to be filed on or be fore May 17, 2013, and any responsive briefs filed on or before May 31, 2013. No reply briefs will be allowed absent leave of the court. On or before May 10, 2013, the parties shall show cause why the above- captioned cases should not be consolidated for the purposes of pretrial motion practice and discovery, in the absence of which the cases will be consolidated for those purposes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
May 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Case Nos. 4:13cv3049; 4:13cv3050; 4:13cv3051; 4:13cv3052; 4:13cv3053; and 4:13cv3054 are hereby consolidated for pretrial motion practice and discovery. Case No. 4:13cv3049 shall be designated as the Lead Case. Case Nos. 4:13cv3050; 4:13cv3 051; 4:13cv3052; 4:13cv3053; and 4:13cv3054 are hereby designated as the Member Cases. The court's CM/ECF System now has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documents filed in the L ead Case will automatically be filed in all Member Cases. To this end, the parties are instructed to file in the Lead Case, No. 4:13cv3049, all further documents except those described in paragraph 4 and to select the option "yes" in respon se to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process.5) If a party believes that an item in addition to those described in paragraph 4 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in one or more individual member cases. The motion must be filed in all the consolidated cases using the spread text feature.Member Cases: 4:13-cv-03049-JMG-CRZ et al.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Estate of Bonnie Matulka, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Dustin J. Kessler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Bonnie Matulka
Represented By: Jeremy C. Jorgenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Doe
Represented By: Jeremy C. Jorgenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Matulka
Represented By: Jeremy C. Jorgenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]