Gibbs v. Houston

Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: John Gibbs
Respondent: Robert Houston
Case Number: 4:2013cv03065
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing no. 11 ) is granted. Gibbs' Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 5, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
June 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copie s of this memorandum and order and the section 2254 petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By July 19, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment the procedures set forth in the order shall be followed. If Respondent elects to file a answer the procedures set forth in the order shall be followed. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 19, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/19/2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
June 20, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Gibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]