Krivda v Sunrise Country, Inc, et al

Defendant: Charliss Marshall and Sunrise Country, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ms. Debra J. Krivda
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03068
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2013 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining 22 Objection to the Subpoena Duces Tecum. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
November 26, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER that the dispositive motion and deposition deadlines are set aside pending further order of the court. The plaintiff's motion for sanctions 33 , and the defendant's Motion for Protective Order 39 , are withdrawn. A settlement confer ence will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge with counsel and representatives of the parties on December 18, 2013, beginning at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
January 22, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER - Defendants' motion for extension of time 56 is granted, and the parties shall have an additional 30 days, until February 18, 2014, to file ajoint sitpulation for dismissal. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 2/18/2014.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Krivda v Sunrise Country, Inc, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charliss Marshall
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Country, Inc.
Represented By: Gail S. Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Debra J. Krivda
Represented By: Neal E. Stenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]