Carlos Nino De Rivera LaJous, et al v. Bruning et al

Defendant: David Sankey and Jon Bruning
Plaintiff: Carlos Nino De Rivera Lajous, Nebraska Firearms Owners Association and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03070
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before October 28, 2013, the parties shall jointly file an amended motion or stipulation for dismissal of this action and provide the undersigned with a proposed judgment for approval and filing. Absent compliance with this order, the court may enter a final judgment pursuant to filing 26 on the terms outlined in the foregoing memorandum. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
October 15, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT adopting 28 Stipulation - For the reasons set forth in the Court's Order on Motion to Dismiss of August 30,2013 (Filing No. 22 ), a. Count I of Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. b. Plaintiff s' claims against the Nebraska Attorney General are dismissed withprejudice. c. Count III of Plaintiffs' Complaint is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Pursuant to Plaintiffs' as-applied Fourteenth Amendmen t Equal Protection claim in Count II, Defendant is permanently enjoined from taking any action to enforce Neb. Rev. Stat. § 69-2433(10) as applied to the application of lawful permanent residents to obtain a permit to carry a concealed han dgun, provided they are otherwise-qualified. Upon entry of the final order and permanent injunction, Defendant shall allow Plaintiffs and other lawful permanent residents residing in Nebraska to apply for, and obtain, a permit to carry a c oncealed handgun, provided they are otherwise-qualified to obtain such a permit pursuant to the Nebraska Concealed Handgun Permit Act. Plaintiffs' shall file an application for attorneys' fees and expenses on or before November 5, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
October 28, 2013 31 Featured Case JUDGMENT - granting 30 joint Stipulation. Plaintiffs are awarded attorney fees and taxable costs in the total amount of $16,980.28, payable by Defendant, David Sankey, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the Nebraska State Patrol. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carlos Nino De Rivera LaJous, et al v. Bruning et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sankey
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gregory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Bruning
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gregory
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Nino De Rivera Lajous
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Bernard J. Glaser, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Firearms Owners Association
Represented By: Bernard J. Glaser, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Bernard J. Glaser, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]