Derr et al v. Annett Holdings, et al

Plaintiff: Jeff Derr and Shawn Derr
Defendant: Bobby Grove, Annett Holdings and TMC Transportation
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03078
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Email Motion to continue progression order by 60 days. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. K opf. Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2014 at 10:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
November 27, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion to Continue.-- Jury Trial set for 9/2/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. --Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2014 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 10, 2014 35 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding SUGGESTION OF DEATH 34 filed by Shawn Derr. On or before May 28, 2014, the decedent's successor or representative, or the remaining plaintiff, shall file a motion for substitution. If the motion for substitution is not timely filed, the claims of the decedent may be subject to dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(a)(1). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 5, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. On or before May 23, 2014, Plaintiff Jeff Derr shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court o f his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of Plaintiff Jeff Derr's claims without further notice. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Jeff Derr at: Jeff Derr, 305 6th Street, Boelus, NE 68820. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed) (JSF)
June 3, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff Jeff Derr is given until June 23, 2014 to show cause why the court should not dismiss his claims, and those of Shawn Derr, his deceased wife, for want of prosecution and without further notice. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Jeff Derr at: 305 6th Street, Boelus, NE 68820. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed) (JSF)
August 18, 2014 44 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 43 Findings and Recommendation. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Derr et al v. Annett Holdings, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Derr
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Herbert J. Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Derr
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Herbert J. Friedman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Grove
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annett Holdings
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMC Transportation
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]