Arriola v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Vikki L Arriola
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03079
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that: 1. the Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. 20 , is granted and the defendant shall on or before October 9, 2013, file and serve the defendant's response; 2. within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief; and 3. in the absence of an order scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 2 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
October 7, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The Defendants Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 22, is granted; the defe ndant shall have on or before November 8, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
November 13, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before December 9, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; w ithin one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 22, 2014 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Commissioner's decision is affirmed The appeal is denied. Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL)
April 9, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The plaintiff's Application and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted; accordingly, the plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of the filing fee. The U.S. Marshal s hall serve the summons and Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Service may be by certified mail pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and Nebraska law in the discretion of the U.S. Marshal. To obtain service of process on the defendant, the plaint iff must complete and return three summons forms and three USM-285 forms. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the Court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with copies of the Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arriola v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikki L Arriola
Represented By: James E. Schneider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]