Roland v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Carol Mae Roland
Defendant: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration and Social Security Administration
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03085
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall on or before October 3, 2013, file and serve the defendants response; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and ei ther party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 2 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
October 1, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The Defendants Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 16, is granted; 2. the defe ndant shall have on or before November 4, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; 3. within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and 4. the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
November 5, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Third Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before December 4, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; wi thin one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
April 22, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting Carole Mae Roland's 2 Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roland v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mae Roland
Represented By: Nichole A. Bohl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]