Emilio v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al

Defendant: Robert P. Houston, L. Antholz, Fred Britten and Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Plaintiff: Pavon Emilio
Case Number: 4:2013cv03088
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Pavon Emilio shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 by 7/3/13, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/3/2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copy mailed to institution as directed)(ADB)
December 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Summons 17 . Plaintiff is to complete and return the 3 summons forms and 3 USM-285 forms that the Clerk will provide. Plaintiff is hereby notified that failure to obtain service of proces s on a defendant by January 13, 2014, may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a Pro Se Case Management Deadline for January 14, 2014: Check for service of summons. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (JSF)
January 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff shall have until February 13, 2014, to complete service of process on Defendants. If Plaintiff fails to complete service of process by the court's deadline, he must show cause why this case should not be dismis sed for his failure to serve Defendants by February 27, 2014. If Plaintiff does not complete service of process by February 13, 2014, and subsequently fails to show good cause for his failure Defendants by February 27, 2014, this action will be dis missed without prejudice and without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/14/2014: check for completion of service of process) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 12, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 26 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff may engage in discovery prior to the issuance of the progression order for the limited purpose of identifying and obtaining addresses for Defendants named in the Complaint. The Clerk o f the court shall send ONE (1) summons forms and ONE (1) USM-285 forms to Plaintiff to complete and return to the Clerk to forward to US Marshal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "April 30, 2014: Check for service of summons on Defendant Antholz." Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (ADB)
June 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to show cause why his claims against Defendant L. Antholz should not be dismissed. Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, his clai ms against L. Antholz will be dismissed and this matter will proceed only as to Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Robert Houston and Fred Britten. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/1/2014: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
July 2, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against Defendant L. Antholz are dismissed without prejudice. The court will enter a separate order progressing this case as to Plaintiff's claims against Robert Houston and Fred Britten. Plaintiff's Motions for Enlargement of Time (Filing No. 34 and Filing No. 35 ) are denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
July 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the court's previous order dismissing Antholz as a defendant from this action 36 is rescinded. The clerk's office is directed to complete the form USM-285, and any other required forms, and forward it, the Compla int, and Filing Number 31 to the Marshal for service of process on Antholz. The Marshal shall serve the summons and Complaint without payment of costs or fees. The clerk's office shall set a pro se case management deadline using the following te xt: September 29, 2014: check completion of service. The dates set forth in the Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Case 37 are suspended pending further notice from the court. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
August 4, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 42 Motion to Extend. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
September 3, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
December 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 48 Motion to Amend. Defendants must file a signed amended answer by December 8, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
December 2, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for March 19, 2015, is cancelled. The conference may be rescheduled after the resolution of Defendants' pending Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk's office is directed to cancel the final pretrial conference scheduled for March 19, 2015. Defendants' Motion to Stay Case Progression 54 is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emilio v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Antholz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Britten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pavon Emilio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]