Woolman v. Tabitha et al

Defendant: Tabitha and Hospis & Health Care Services
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Case Number: 4:2013cv03116
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to File the Petition Out of Time 9 is granted 9 . This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against the defendant in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs claims against the defendant will be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to d o so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/17/2013: Check for amended complaint onOctober 17, 2013) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolman v. Tabitha et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospis & Health Care Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]