Woolman v. CBS/MY Tv / 10/11

Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Defendant: CBS/MY Tv / 10/11
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03117
Filed: June 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance and Extension of Time (filing no. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
June 21, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before July 22, 2013. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 22, 2013: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed with forms to pro se party)(AOA)
July 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The leave to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
July 24, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff shall have until August 23, 2013, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amend ed complaint, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: Check for amended complaint on August 23, 2013. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Extension of Time (filing no. 6 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
August 30, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. All pending Motions are denied. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woolman v. CBS/MY Tv / 10/11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS/MY Tv / 10/11
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]