Miller v. Houston

Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Robert E. Miller
Respondent: Robert Houston
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03128
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Motion for Hearing. The clerk's office is directed to mail to Petitioner a copy of the docket sheet in this matter together with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with docket sheet as directed)(ADB)
May 5, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
July 17, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that upon initial review of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 filed by Robert E. Miller, by August 30, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Cle rk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 30, 2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elect s to file an answer, the following procedures shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner: By August 30, 2013, Respondent shall file all state court records which are relevant to the cognizable claims. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 30, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and copy mailed as directed)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miller v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert E. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Represented By: George R. Love
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]