Robinson v. Huerta et al

Defendant: Marc L. Warren, Lacey N. Jones, Michael P. Huerta, Brent Hart and A. Lester Haizlip
Plaintiff: Eric Robinson
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03130
Filed: July 8, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
September 24, 2013 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Eric Robinson. Petitioner's request for a writ of mandamus fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the da te of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended petition in which he alleges that "he has exhausted all other avenues of relief" and shows that the FAA "owes him a clear nondiscretionary duty" to investigate the circumstances under which he was terminated from his employment. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management set for 10/24/2013: Review amended petition. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
January 7, 2014 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth in this Memorandum and Order and in the court's Memorandum and Order dated September 24, 2013, this matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. Huerta et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey N. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Huerta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Hart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Lester Haizlip
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]