McCowin et al v. Nebraska State Penitentiary

Respondent: Nebraska State Penitentiary
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Gary McCowin
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03132
Filed: July 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: McCowin's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
July 24, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's application to proceed IFP (filing no. 2 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted until 30 days from date of this Memorandum and Order to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 26, 2013: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 8, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: On the court's own motion, Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice because Petitioner has not exhausted his state court remedies. Failure to respond to the court's Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 8, 2013: Deadline for Petitioner to show cause why case should not be dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCowin et al v. Nebraska State Penitentiary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nebraska State Penitentiary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary McCowin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]