Linc-Drop, Inc. v. City of Lincoln et al

Defendant: Carl Eskridge, Doug Emery, Jonathan Cook, City of Lincoln, Roy Christensen, Jon Camp, Chris Beutler, Trent Fellers and Leirion Gaylor Baird
Plaintiff: Linc-Drop, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03133
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Continue. On or before August 2, 2013, the parties shall file an Abbreviated Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
October 31, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
November 26, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to seal (filing 52 ) is granted in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to restrict access to the plaintiff's supplemental evidence index (filing 53 ) to court users and case participants. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to regenerate the NEF for the plaintiff's supplemental evidence index (filing 53 ) in order to provide notice of filing 53 to the parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
December 2, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The defendants' Statement of Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order (filing 51 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
December 2, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties are hereby notified that the Court is considering whether to consolidate trial on the merits with the December 9, 2013, motion hearing on the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a) (2). Any party objecting to consolidation is directed to show cause, on or before 3 p.m. on December 6, 2013, why consolidation would be inappropriate. The parties are directed to advise the Court, on or before 3 p.m. on December 6, 2013, if a dditional evidence or briefing would be required should the Court order consolidation pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2). The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a show cause deadline of December 6, 2013. Show Cause Deadline set for 12/6/2013.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
December 6, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The defendants' objection (filing 59 ) is sustained. The December 9, 2013 hearing on the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is canceled, and the motion for preliminary injunction (filing 3 ) is fully submitted. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
February 18, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Linc-Drop's motion for a preliminary injunction (filing 3 ) is granted. The City, and its officers, agents, and employees, are preliminarily enjoined from enforcing any aspect of the Ordinance, pending a final judgment in this case. This case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for further case progression. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linc-Drop, Inc. v. City of Lincoln et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Eskridge
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Emery
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cook
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Christensen
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Camp
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Beutler
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Fellers
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leirion Gaylor Baird
Represented By: Rodney M. Confer
Represented By: Jocelyn W. Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linc-Drop, Inc.
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Represented By: Jack L. Shultz
Represented By: Robert B. Truhe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]