Fritz v. Colvin

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sue Fritz
Case Number: 4:2013cv03186
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Defendant's Second 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief 10 . The Defendant shall have on or before May 27, 2014, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (MKR)
May 23, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Nichole Bohl has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Attorney Bohl is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why this fee cannot be paid within 30 days from the date of this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JLS, )
July 25, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Commissioner's decision is affirmed; The appeal is denied; and Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritz v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sue Fritz
Represented By: Nichole A. Bohl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]