Loseke v. DePalma Hotel Corporation

Plaintiff: Colette Loseke
Defendant: DePalma Hotel Corporation and BK Holdings, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03191
Filed: November 8, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline, (Filing No. 20 ), is granted. The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is May 15, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
July 14, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant BK Holdings, LLC (filing 30 ) is granted. The plaintiff's claims against BK Holdings, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. BK Holdings, LLC is dismissed as a party. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
July 24, 2014 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The parties' Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement (filing 35 ) is denied without prejudice. The pretrial conference set for September 16, 2014, and jury trial set to begin on September 29, 2014, are cancel led, and this case is removed from the trial docket, pending approval of the parties' settlement agreement. On or before August 25, 2014, the parties shall submit a renewed motion for approval of their settlement agreement, and supporting evi dence consistent with this order. On or before August 25, 2014, the parties shall show cause why the Court should not lift the restriction on their settlement agreement (filing 33 ) and make that document part of the public record. Absent su ch cause, the Court may lift the restriction without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a case management deadline of August 26, 2014, with the following text: "Check on status of settlement agreement." Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Loseke v. DePalma Hotel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Loseke
Represented By: Daniel Hassing
Represented By: Craig F. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePalma Hotel Corporation
Represented By: Susan M. Schneider
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BK Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradley D. Holtorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]