Huggett v. Cami-Automotive, Inc. et al

Defendant: Cami-Automotive, Inc., General Motors of Canada and Suzuki Motor Corporation
Plaintiff: Michealla Huggett
 
Case Number: 7:2010cv05006
Filed: May 14, 2010
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 40 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
November 1, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge on October 31, 2011, by Michael J. Javoronok, counsel for the plaintiff. On or before January 3, 2012, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other di spositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the lik e) may be dismissed without further notice. The pretrial conference and trial previously scheduled are cancelled, and the plaintiffs motion in limine (Filing No. 62 ) is terminated, upon the representation that this case is settled. ***Set All Deadlines: ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 1/3/2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
December 22, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The court being duly advised, finds that the above-captioned action has been settled among the parties, and the matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Huggett v. Cami-Automotive, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cami-Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Q. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors of Canada
Represented By: Mary Q. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor Corporation
Represented By: Mary Q. Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michealla Huggett
Represented By: Kristine R. Cecava
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]