Gasner v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gasner
Case Number: 7:2012cv05007
Filed: August 20, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Magistrate Judge Zwart's findings and recommendation (filing 10 ) is adopted. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Final judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
October 19, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 11, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The plaintiff is given until Monday, January 7, 2013 to comply with the court's order of October 19, 2012 or to show cause why her claims should not be dismissed for want of prosecution, in the absence of which the plaintiff's claims against the defendants may be dismissed and a judgment of dismissal may be entered without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gasner v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gasner
Represented By: Maren L. Chaloupka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]