Smith Jr. v. Colvin

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Larry Dean Smith Jr.
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv05004
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before November 14, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; within one week after th e defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
November 19, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before December 16, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Commissioner's decision is affirmed. The appeal is denied. Judgment in favor of the defendant will be entered in a separate document. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith Jr. v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dean Smith Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Cuddigan
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]