United States of America v. Mathews et al

Defendant: General Collection, Credit Service Associates, Raymond A. Mathews, Pauline E. Mathews, Adam R. Lucero, Resurgent Capital Services and Camille R. Hawk
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 8:2007cv00422
Filed: October 26, 2007
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Dawson
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE in the amount of $30,319.04 plus accrued interest of 9.5 percent computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full; setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises; granting P laintiff USA's motion for default judgment 45 against Defendant Pauline E. Mathews, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Credit Service Associates, Inc., d/b/a Credit Bureau of Kearney and General Collection Co. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKL) Modified on 10/16/2008 to correct text. (LKL).
October 24, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC - Upon consideration of the Motion for an Order Nunc Pro Tunc filed by the Plaintiff (filing 48 ), it is hereby ordered that the Consent Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure and Order of Sale (filing 47 ) be amended by inserting the correct statutory judgment rate of interest at 1.24% on page 3, line 2. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
March 23, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding MOTION to Confirm Sale 55 . Any person wishing to object to confirmation of the Marshal's sale conducted herein shall, not later than April 13, 2009, file with the Clerk and serve upon the parties to this action a written object ion to confirmation of sale setting forth the basis for said objection. In the event that an objection to confirmation of sale is filed by the date specified above, all issues raised by said objection will be heard before the Court at 12:00 p.m. on April 27, 2009, in Courtroom No. 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the parties listed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed). (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Mathews et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Collection
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Service Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Mathews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline E. Mathews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam R. Lucero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille R. Hawk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]