Jones v. The State of Nebraska et al

Petitioner: Marvel Jones
Respondent: The State of Nebraska, The Nebraska Attorney General's Office and The Lancaster County Attorney's and District Attorney's Offices
 
Case Number: 8:2008cv00543
Filed: December 24, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Mandamus & Other Office
County: Johnson
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2009 18 Featured Case STRICKEN - ORDER that upon the oral motion of counsel for the parties, the telephone planning conference previously set for 6/15/09 at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled and is rescheduled for 6/19/09 at 11:00 a.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF) Stricken on 6/1/2009 per order 19 (JSF).
July 30, 2009 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (filing no. 10 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 23, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER regarding 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until February 21, 2009, to either show cause why this caseshould not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the full$350.00 filing fee. In the ab sence of either action by Plaintiff, this matter willbe dismissed without further notice; and2. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadlinein this matter with the following text: February 21, 2009: Deadline for Plaintiffto show cause or pay full filing fee. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(PCV, )
March 6, 2009 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus is (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones v. The State of Nebraska et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvel Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Nebraska Attorney General's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Lancaster County Attorney's and District Attorney's Offices
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]