United States of America v. Anderson, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elizabeth Anderson and Unifund CCR Partners
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00023
Filed: January 15, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Dawes
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE - Owing to the plaintiff the principal sum of $71,233.73, plus accrued interest in the amount of $5,053.04, together with interest accruing at the rate of $12.3547 per day from July 28, 2008, until the date of entry of this decree. Interest will accrue at the legal rate of.48% computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full. Setting priority of liens and directing sale of premises. Granting plaintiff's motion for default judgment 10 against defendants Elizabeth Anderson and Unifund CCR Partners. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to defendants)(JAE, )
August 24, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw its motion for default judgment 10 . The hearing scheduled for 8/24/09 is canceled and the magistrate judge is ordered to progress this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF) Modified on 8/24/2009 to include copy mailed to pro se party (JSF).
August 25, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff shall file a joint status report by 9/29/09. The parties shall confer about the content of the status report prior to 9/29/09. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to Ms. Anderson at her last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
December 23, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall file the defendants December 14, 2009, correspondence as a request for appointment of counsel. The Clerk of Court shall file the defendants December 14, 2009, notebook of documents as an attachment, to be maintain ed in the office of the clerk of court, to the defendants motion for request for appointment of counsel; denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Ms. Anderson at her last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
December 8, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND ORDER OF SALE - That there is due and owing to the Plaintiff in rem as of June 8, 2010, a balance of $68,100.20 in principal, $15,454.84 in interest, $68.74 in late charges, and $7,087.13 in fees currently assessed and required, for a total of $90,710.91. Interest willaccrue on said sums from and after the date of entry of this decree at the legal rate of 0.28 % computed daily and compounded annually until paid in full as to defendants Elizabeth Anderson and Unifund CCR Partners. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to defendants via US Mail)(KBJ)
January 4, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to send the appropriate affidavit to the defendant. The defendant shall submit the completed affidavit to the court within 14 days of the date of this order, at which time the court will consider the defendant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(AOA)
February 7, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting the defendant to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis as to defendant Elizabeth Anderson. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 28, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING SALE granting 66 Motion Confirm Sale. The sale should be, and hereby is confirmed. The United States Marshal make and deliver his deed to the purchaser of the heretofore described real estate. The Clerk of the United States District Court shall make disbursements of the proceeds of the sale as set out in the Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure filed herein. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (1 Certified copy to USM)(GJG)
June 1, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff has until 6/15/09 to file a motion for Clerk's entry of default or show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute the defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Anderson, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifund CCR Partners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]