Perez Giron v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Petitioner: Juan Carlos Perez Giron
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00055
Filed: February 9, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Other Immigration Actions Office
County: Platte
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2009 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- This matter is dismissed without prejudice because petitioner failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with the court's orders. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 24, 2009 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 4 the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 6, 2009 7 Featured Case STRICKEN-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1) is deemed insufficient and the court will not act upon it. On or before April 16, 2009, Petitioner must submit a signed Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. In the Amended Petition, Petitioner must specify the grounds for relief, the facts supporting each ground, and the relief requested. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the Petition without further notice. The Clerk o f the court is directed to send Petitioner a Form AO 241 packet, Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the followi ng text: April 16, 2009: deadline for Petitioner to submit Amended Petition. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/16/2009.) Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed as directed to pro se party )(MKR) Modified on 4/2/2009 to strike per Order # 9(MKR).
March 9, 2009 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The pending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1 ) is deemed insufficient and the court will not act upon it. On or before April 20, 2009, Petitioner must submit a signed Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . In the Amended Petition, Petitioner must specify the grounds for relief, the facts supporting each ground, and the relief requested.Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the Petition without further notice. The Clerk of the c ourt is directed to send Petitioner a Form AO 241 packet, Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: April 20, 2009: deadline for Petitioner to submit Amended Petition.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perez Giron v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Carlos Perez Giron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]