International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan et al v. Absolute Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan, IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A, IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B, Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vaction-Holiday Trust Fund and Julie Fast
Defendant: Absolute Industries, Inc. and Absolute Power & Communications, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00102
Filed: March 19, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Douglas
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) planning report by the close of business on Thursday, October 22, 2009 or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the court's deadline. Show Cause Deadline set for 10/22/2009.Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
July 19, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - On or before August 20, 2010, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal or other dispositive stipulation, and shall submit to Judge Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov a proposed order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case, including all counterclaims and the like, may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (GJG)
November 5, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Filing No. 35 ) is approved. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Each named party will pay its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan et al v. Absolute Industries, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 22 and National Electrical Contractors Association Nebraska Chapter Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Pension Plan A
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 22/NECA Defined Contribution Plan B
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omaha Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local No. 22 Vaction-Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Fast
Represented By: Scott L. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Power & Communications, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]